California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB231 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 5, 2015

Amended

Bill May 26, 2015
Bill March 16, 2015