|
09/09/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6107.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4970.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2016
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/03/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4788.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/03/2016
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|