California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 10, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 5, 2016