California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2329 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill June 29, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016