Assembly
|
02/01/2016
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2016
|
Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2015
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/24/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|