California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill May 24, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 29, 2016