LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2337
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2337
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2337
Compare Versions
AB2337 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2337 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB2337 Amended August 4, 2016
AB2337 Amended June 9, 2016
AB2337 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2337 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2337 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2337 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2337 Enrolled August 23, 2016
AB2337 Amended August 4, 2016
AB2337 Amended June 9, 2016
AB2337 Amended April 20, 2016
AB2337 Amended March 18, 2016
AB2337 Introduced February 18, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare