Assembly | 04/21/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | In committee: Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 03/03/2016 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |