|
09/16/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 385, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/16/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6044.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4981.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/10/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5007.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4887.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/31/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|