Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2015 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 07/06/2015 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2015 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2015 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2015 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 1705.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2015 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2015 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2015 | Read first time. To print. |