California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill May 27, 2016