|
07/15/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1755.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2015
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|