California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 14, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 11, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 19, 2016