|
08/30/2016
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2016
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4873.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5051.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|