|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 573, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6460.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5425.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4788.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/14/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|