Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2016
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/21/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/18/2016
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|