California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2371 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill May 12, 2016
Bill March 18, 2016