Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5123.) | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |