California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill June 2, 2016
Bill May 9, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016