Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | Measure version as amended on April 4 corrected. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/31/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |