California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 17, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 21, 2016