California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2394 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill March 28, 2016