Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 05/27/2016 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/25/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 13). | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | ||
Assembly | 02/18/2016 | Read first time. To print. |