California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 9, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016