Senate
|
11/30/2016
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1447.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/07/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2015
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/10/2015
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on V.A. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/06/2015
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/05/2015
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|