LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2404
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2404
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2404
Compare Versions
AB2404 Chaptered August 26, 2016
AB2404 Enrolled August 16, 2016
AB2404 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2404 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2404 Amended April 12, 2016
AB2404 Amended March 15, 2016
AB2404 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2404 Chaptered August 26, 2016
AB2404 Enrolled August 16, 2016
AB2404 Amended August 2, 2016
AB2404 Amended June 13, 2016
AB2404 Amended April 12, 2016
AB2404 Amended March 15, 2016
AB2404 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare