|
08/17/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 135, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5639.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4646.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4626.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/08/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|