LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2419
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2419
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2419
Action History
Assembly
11/30/2016
From committee without further action.
Assembly
04/19/2016
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Assembly
03/08/2016
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Assembly
02/22/2016
Read first time.
Assembly
02/21/2016
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
Assembly
02/19/2016
Introduced. To print.