Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2016 | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2015 | Read first time. To print. |