California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016