Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 4815.) | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 25). | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/17/2016 | Referred to Coms. on ED. and REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |