Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on unfinished business file, reconsideration pending. | ||
Assembly | 06/01/2016 | August 31-Motion to reconsider continued. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2016 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 25. Noes 38. Page 5052.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Roger Hernández. | ||
Assembly | 05/19/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 18). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (April 19). | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 04/06/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |