LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2437
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2437
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2437
Compare Versions
AB2437 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2437 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2437 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2437 Amended June 22, 2016
AB2437 Amended April 25, 2016
AB2437 Amended March 31, 2016
AB2437 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2437 Chaptered September 14, 2016
AB2437 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2437 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2437 Amended June 22, 2016
AB2437 Amended April 25, 2016
AB2437 Amended March 31, 2016
AB2437 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare