Senate | 11/30/2016 | From Senate committee without further action. | ||
Senate | 06/29/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2016 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/23/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 4889.) | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 20). | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |