Assembly | 02/01/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/12/2016 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2015 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2015 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2015 | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/10/2015 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | ||
Assembly | 02/09/2015 | Read first time. To print. |