California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2444 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 23, 2016
Bill June 1, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill April 13, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016