California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2450 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2016

Amended

Bill August 2, 2016
Bill June 15, 2016
Bill April 25, 2016
Bill April 12, 2016