Assembly | 11/30/2016 | From committee without further action. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |