Assembly | 11/30/2016 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2016 | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Rodriguez. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/28/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/12/2016 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 30). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |