California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 16, 2016
Bill August 2, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill May 4, 2016
Bill April 26, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016