|
09/21/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 417, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6196.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5123.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/02/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2016
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 4891.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2016
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2016
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2016
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/19/2016
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|