California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2016

Amended

Bill May 16, 2016
Bill May 13, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016