Assembly | 06/06/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/14/2016 | Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |