California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Amended

Bill June 14, 2016
Bill May 31, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016