Assembly | 05/18/2016 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2016 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 04/18/2016 | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.) (pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |