LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2466
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2466
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2466
Compare Versions
AB2466 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2466 Enrolled August 18, 2016
AB2466 Amended May 3, 2016
AB2466 Amended April 6, 2016
AB2466 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2466 Chaptered September 28, 2016
AB2466 Enrolled August 18, 2016
AB2466 Amended May 3, 2016
AB2466 Amended April 6, 2016
AB2466 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare