Senate | 11/30/2016 | Died on Senate inactive file. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2016 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hancock. | ||
Senate | 08/02/2016 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/01/2016 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2016 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2016 | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | ||
Senate | 05/12/2016 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/12/2016 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4783.) | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2016 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2016 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 4). | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2016 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2016 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2016 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | ||
Assembly | 02/19/2016 | Introduced. To print. |