LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2485
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2485
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2485
Compare Versions
AB2485 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB2485 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2485 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2485 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2485 Amended April 11, 2016
AB2485 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2485 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 1 (Old)
AB2485 Chaptered September 24, 2016
AB2485 Enrolled August 25, 2016
AB2485 Amended August 15, 2016
AB2485 Amended May 27, 2016
AB2485 Amended April 11, 2016
AB2485 Amended March 30, 2016
AB2485 Introduced February 19, 2016
Version 2 (New)
Compare