California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2486 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/09/2016

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2486CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 270 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2016 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2016 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 27, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2016 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 28, 2016 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Baker (Coauthor: Assembly Member Bonilla) FEBRUARY 19, 2016 An act to add Section 7018 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2486, Baker. Contractors' State License Board: license search by location. The Contractors' State License Law provides for the licensure and regulation of contractors by the Contractors' State License Board, which is within the Department of Consumer Affairs. Existing law requires the board to appoint a registrar and requires the registrar, as specified, to publish a list of the names and addresses of contractors registered under that law. This bill would require the board, prior to January 1, 2019, to add an enhancement to the current contractor license check search function that would permit consumers to search for a licensed contractor by either ZIP Code or geographic location. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 7018 is added to the Business and Professions Code, to read: 7018. Prior to January 1, 2019, the board shall add an enhancement to the current contractor license check search function that permits consumers to search for a licensed contractor by either ZIP Code or geographic location.