California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2016

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 16, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 14, 2016
Bill March 31, 2016
Bill March 17, 2016